This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2022 at 04:11:18 (UTC).

K7 Design Group, Inc. et al v. Five Below, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 K7 Design Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Five Below, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-MC-00014

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

K7 Design Group, Inc.

K7 Design Group, LLC

Defendant

Five Below, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wei Lun Ho

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

12 #5

Proposed Order

12 #4

Declaration of Allen Ho in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion f

12 #3

Exhibit C in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Sh

12 #2

Exhibit B in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Sh

12 #1

Exhibit A in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Sh

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FIVE BELOW, INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order, HK Trans shall produce all documents and things in its possession that are responsive to the revised August 4, 2021 Subpoena, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTES OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION RELATED TO SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT; Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The Court GRANTS the pending Motion. The Court will issue its separate order granting. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR- Recording. (hr) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints-->>Return of Service of Summons and Complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Five Below, Inc., PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF ECF DOCUMENTS TO HK TRANS, LLC C/O LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. served on October 29, 2021. (Ho, Wei) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: re: MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 . Respondent is hereby ordered to file a written response to Defendant's Motion with the Court by November 5, 2021. Defendant is ordered to serve a copy of this order on Respondent by October 30, 2021, and to file a proof of service of this order with the Court by November 1, 2021. The Court will hold a video hearing on the motion on November 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom, which the parties can join by visiting Magistrate Judge Kewalramani's procedures and schedules at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-shashi-h-kewalramani to obtain the Zoom Webinar link information. (dc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

1 #3

Declaration of Allen Ho in Support of Defendant's Motion to Enfore Subpoena

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt filed by Defendant Five Below, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt, #2 Exhibit B in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt, #3 Exhibit C in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt, #4 Declaration of Allen Ho in Support of Defendant Five Below, Inc.'s Motion for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt, #5 Proposed Order) (Ho, Wei) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FIVE BELOW, INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order, HK Trans shall produce all documents and things in its possession that are responsive to the revised August 4, 2021 Subpoena, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION RELATED TO SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT; Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The Court GRANTS the pending Motion. The Court will issue its separate order granting. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR- Recording. (hr) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints-->>Return of Service of Summons and Complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Five Below, Inc., PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF ECF DOCUMENTS TO HK TRANS, LLC C/O LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. served on October 29, 2021. (Ho, Wei) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: re: MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 . Respondent is hereby ordered to file a written response to Defendant's Motion with the Court by November 5, 2021. Defendant is ordered to serve a copy of this order on Respondent by October 30, 2021, and to file a proof of service of this order with the Court by November 1, 2021. The Court will hold a video hearing on the motion on November 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom, which the parties can join by visiting Magistrate Judge Kewalramani's procedures and schedules at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-shashi-h-kewalramani to obtain the Zoom Webinar link information. (dc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Propsed] Order Granting Motion to Enforce Subpoena re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ho, Wei) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Five Below, Inc., identifying K7 Design Group, Inc., K7 Design Group, LLC, Five Below, Inc., HK Trans, LLC. (Ho, Wei) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Proposed Order in Missing (ghap) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-32143268 - Fee: $49, filed by Defendant Five Below, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Allen Ho in Support of Defendant's Motion to Enfore Subpoena) (Attorney Wei Lun Ho added to party Five Below, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ho, Wei) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K7 Design Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIVE BELOW INC. is a litigant