This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 08:54:56 (UTC).

K. et al v. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 K filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill N. Parrish and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00370

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jill N. Parrish

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J. K.

K. K.

Defendants

Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield

General Dynamics Corporation

General Dynamics Corporation Anthem BCBS Premium HSA and Premium Plus HSA Benefits Plan, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs J. K., K. K. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 06/13/2022. (lwh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #3 filed by Plaintiffs J. K., K. K. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #3 filed by Plaintiffs J. K., K. K. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 06/14/2022. (lwh) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 06/13/2022. (lwh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation Anthem BCBS Premium HSA and Premium Plus HSA Benefits Plan, The (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4351205) filed by J. K., K. K.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs J. K., K. K. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel M. Hall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent J. Newton