Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2019 at 07:36:10 (UTC).

K and M Royal Group, LLC v. G and P Strategies, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 K and M Royal Group, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against G and P Strategies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02006

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K and M Royal Group, LLC

Defendants

Edward Vignone

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

G and P Strategies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gina Joan Kim

Attorney at Law Office of Gina J Kim

5557 E Santa Ana Canyon Road Suite 215

Anaheim, CA 92807-3129

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#8

(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Harbor Justice Center. Case number: 30-2019-01097730-CL-UD-HNB. (jp) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) Improper removal. Plaintiff could not have initiated this unlawful detainer action in Federal Court. See Order Remanding Case to State Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Edward Vignone. (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edward Vignone (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Orange, case number 30-02019-01097730-CL-UD-HNB with Conformed copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, filed by Defendant Edward Vignone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Harbor Justice Center. Case number: 30-2019-01097730-CL-UD-HNB. (jp) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) Improper removal. Plaintiff could not have initiated this unlawful detainer action in Federal Court. See Order Remanding Case to State Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(jdo) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Edward Vignone. (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edward Vignone (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Orange, case number 30-02019-01097730-CL-UD-HNB with Conformed copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, filed by Defendant Edward Vignone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GP STRATEGIES CORPORATION DBA GP SANDY A SUBDIVIDION OF GP STRATEGIES is a litigant