This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 07:43:30 (UTC).

Jyoti v. Cuccinelli

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 a Immigration - Other Immigration case was filed by Jyoti against Cuccinelli in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04135

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vijaya Jyoti

Defendant

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hassan M Shihab

Attorney at Shihab & Associates

65 E. State Street, Suite 1550

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (ew) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Vijaya Jyoti (Shihab, Hassan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II; U.S. Attorney; and U.S. Attorney General. (ew) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7112526), filed by Vijaya Jyoti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (Shihab, Hassan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less