This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2020 at 20:34:19 (UTC).

JUUL Labs Inc. v. LMD Ventures, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 JUUL Labs Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against LMD Ventures, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00984

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUUL Labs Inc.

Defendant

LMD Ventures, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley E. Chambers

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

1301 Mckinney - Ste 3700

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorney

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LMD Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell T. Wong on behalf of LMD Ventures, Inc.. Attorney Russell T. Wong added to party LMD Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUUL Labs Inc.. LMD Ventures, Inc. served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to LMD Ventures, Inc. (rg) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JUUL Labs Inc.. (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13881973). No Summons requested at this time, filed by JUUL Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: LMD Ventures, Inc. answer due 11/9/2020. (rg) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to November 9, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LMD Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell T. Wong on behalf of LMD Ventures, Inc.. Attorney Russell T. Wong added to party LMD Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUUL Labs Inc.. LMD Ventures, Inc. served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to LMD Ventures, Inc. (rg) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JUUL Labs Inc.. (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13881973). No Summons requested at this time, filed by JUUL Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley E. Chambers