This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2022 at 07:40:14 (UTC).

JUUL Labs, Inc. v. Bolan Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 JUUL Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Bolan Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Terry R Means. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry R Means

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUUL Labs, Inc.

Defendant

Bolan Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley E Chambers

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bolan Enterprises, Inc. filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12602430) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet) (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #5

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (wxc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/16/2022) (wxc). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Bolan Enterprises, Inc.. (wxc) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bolan Enterprises, Inc.. (wxc) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (wxc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/16/2022) (wxc). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bolan Enterprises, Inc. filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12602430) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet) (Chambers, Bradley) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less