This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:27:13 (UTC).

Justina Carrasco v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Justina Carrasco filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Robinhood Financial LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney, Autumn D. Spaeth, Virginia A. Phillips and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01202

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Cormac J. Carney

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judges

Autumn D. Spaeth

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justina Carrasco

Defendants

Robinhood Financial LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Anthony Suppa

Attorney at Estelle and Kennedy, APC

367 North 2Nd Avenue

Upland, CA 91786

Michael Linzymiah Kennedy

Attorney at Estelle and Kennedy, A Professional Law Corporation

367 North 2Nd Avenue

Upland, CA 91786

Defendant Attorneys

Naeun Rim

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Craig Steven Rutenberg

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew D. Huynh

Attorney at Cravath Swaine and Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Antony L. Ryan

Attorney at Cravath Swaine and Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Kevin J. Orsini

Attorney at Cravath Swaine and Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#38

37 #1

Proposed Order

37 #37

Main Document

#36

33 #1

Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case P

33 #33

Main Document

#35

30 #1

Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case P

30 #30

Main Document

#23

#5

#4

#3

#2

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#39) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Florida, 1:21-cv-22702 filed 7/27/2021. (iv) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Conditional Transfer Order - 4 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2989, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Judge Altonaga. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31678327) filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617719) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #7 #23 #30 Non-Resident Attorney Antony L. Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and for Robinhood Securities, LLC, designating Naeun Rim as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini, APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and for Robinhood Securities, LLC, designating Naeun Rim as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617719) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case PRO HAC VICE) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617732) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case PRO HAC VICE) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Justina Carrasco in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Justina Carrasco in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617739) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617732) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617719) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Related Case(s): 21-CV- 00835-VAP-MRW, 21-CV- 00837-FMO, 21-CV-00843- CBM-E, 2:21-cv-02230 VAP, and 30-2021-01202793-CU-FR-CJC (Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01202793 Receipt No: ACACDC-31617487 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg added to party ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Rutenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antony L Ryan