This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:55:13 (UTC).

Justice v. USA

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Justice filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Steven Justice

Glenville, WV 26351

Respondent

USA

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/15/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/24/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Steven Justice. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

4 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

2 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#2

(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Steven Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/20/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 07/18/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 07/18/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/15/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/24/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Steven Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/20/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Steven Justice. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.