This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 15:59:07 (UTC).

Just Puppies, Inc. et al v. Frosh

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Just Puppies, Inc filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Frosh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Mark Coulson and Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01281

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J. Mark Coulson

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson

Tara Baker

Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet

Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique

Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville

Just Puppies, Inc. doing business as Just Puppies Towson

Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Just Puppies Rockville

Charm City Puppies, LLC doing business as Charm City Puppies & Boutique

Sobrad, LLC doing business as Pinnacle Pet

Tara Baker doing business as Valley View Kennel

Defendant

Brian E. Frosh

Amicus Curiae

The Humane Society of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather Kirkwood Yeung

Attorney at Kagan Stern Marinello & Beard, LLC

238 West Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

Jonathan P Kagan

Attorney at Kagan Stern Marinello & Beard, LLC

238 West Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

Meagan Cooper Borgerson

Attorney at Kagan Stern Marinello & Beard, LLC

238 West Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

Defendant Attorney

Ryan Robert Dietrich

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Maryland

200 St. Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Ralph Henry

Attorney at The Humane Society of the United States

1255 23Rd Street Nwsuite 450

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Order

#17

14 #2

Exhibit

#14

9 #4

Text of Proposed Order

9 #3

Exhibit

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Memorandum in Support Consolidated memorandum in support of motion to dismiss an

#9

#2

1 #9

Summons

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER confirming the substance of discussions during the emergency telephone conference held on 7/20/21. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/20/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2021: #1 Order) (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketTelephone Status Conference held on 7/20/2021 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed by Brian E. Frosh.(Dietrich, Ryan) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Proposed Order (Borgerson, Meagan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) QC NOTICE: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tara Baker, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Sobrad, LLC, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #14 . (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Borgerson, Meagan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Memorandum of Law of the Humane Society of the United States, as Amicus Curiae, in Support of #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Humane Society of the United States' Consent Motion for Leave to File a memorandum of law supporting Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/21/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Humane Society of the United States identifying Other Affiliate The Fund For Animals, Inc., Other Affiliate Humane Society International, Other Affiliate Humane Society Veterinary Medical Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Doris Day Animal League, Other Affiliate Humane Society Legislative Fund, Other Affiliate Friends of Humane Society International for the Protection and Conservation of Animals, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-United Kingdom, Other Affiliate Humane Society International Latin America, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-India, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-Canada, Other Affiliate Humane Society of the United States California Branch, Other Affiliate Humane Society of the United States New Jersey Branch, Other Affiliate The Humane Society Wildlife Land Trust, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-Europe, Other Affiliate Project Chimps, Other Affiliate Humane Society International Mexico, A.C., Other Affiliate Humane Society International-Africa, Other Affiliate The Humane Society Legislative Fund Policy Action Committee, Other Affiliate Humane Society International Korea for The Humane Society of the United States.(Henry, Ralph) (Entered: 06/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum by The Humane Society of the United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Amicus Curiae Memorandum)(Henry, Ralph) (Entered: 06/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/16/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian E. Frosh (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Ryan) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Robert Dietrich on behalf of Brian E. Frosh (Dietrich, Ryan) (Entered: 06/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Attachment)(Kagan, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC (Borgerson, Meagan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Confirming the substance of the discussions during the Telephone Conference held on May 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Brian E. Frosh.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeficiency Notice to Just Puppies, Inc., Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Charm City Puppies, LLC, Sobrad, LLC, Tara Baker. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/1/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9293444.), filed by Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Charm City Puppies, LLC, Tara Baker, Sobrad, LLC, Just Puppies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Borgerson, Meagan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Humane Society of the United States is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ralph Edgar Henry