This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 07:56:55 (UTC).

Juscinska v. Drybar Holdings LLC

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Juscinska filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Drybar Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09300

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalia Juscinska

Defendant

Drybar Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erik Mathew Bashian

Attorney at Bashian & Papantoniou, P.C

500 Old Country Road, Suite 302

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Samuel Sverdlov

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Drybar Holdings LLC answer due 1/20/2021. (rro) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's request is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 20, 2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/16/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File requesting a thirty (30) day extension of time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint, up to and including January 20, 2021... addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Samuel Sverdlov, Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Document filed by Drybar Holdings LLC..(Sverdlov, Samuel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Sverdlov on behalf of Drybar Holdings LLC..(Sverdlov, Samuel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Drybar Holdings LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Natalia Juscinska..(Bashian, Erik) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on January 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan). (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/6/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drybar Holdings LLC. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Drybar Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Natalia Juscinska..(Bashian, Erik) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bashian, Erik) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Drybar Holdings LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22456208)Document filed by Natalia Juscinska..(Bashian, Erik) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less