This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 09:00:21 (UTC).

Jurkowski v. Lowes Home Center, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Jurkowski filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lowes Home Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura A. Jurkowski

Defendant

Lowes Home Center, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Javon Gibson

Attorney at Reifkind, Thompson, & Rudzinski, LLP

3333 W. Commercial Blvd, Suite 200

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorney

Reed Russell

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 2000

Tampa, FL 33602-5315

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Laura A. Jurkowski. Related case(s): No (Gibson, Brandon) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Laura A. Jurkowski. (Gibson, Brandon) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Lowes Home Center, LLC. (SEG) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. The parties are compelled to arbitrate the claims asserted by Plaintiff Laura A. Jurkowski against Defendant Lowe's Home Center. This case is STAYED pending the arbitration of Jurkowski's claims against Lowe's Home Center, LLC. The parties shall file a notice informing the Court that the arbitration has been concluded, or that their dispute has otherwise been resolved, within ten days of either of such events. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines and administratively close this file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/11/2022. (BGS) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase Stayed. (CTR) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. The parties are compelled to arbitrate the claims asserted by Plaintiff Laura A. Jurkowski against Defendant Lowe's Home Center. This case is STAYED pending the arbitration of Jurkowski's claims against Lowe's Home Center, LLC. The parties shall file a notice informing the Court that the arbitration has been concluded, or that their dispute has otherwise been resolved, within ten days of either of such events. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines and administratively close this file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/11/2022. (BGS) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by Lowes Home Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Russell, Reed) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Lowes Home Center, LLC. (SEG) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Laura A. Jurkowski. (Gibson, Brandon) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Laura A. Jurkowski. Related case(s): No (Gibson, Brandon) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-1643-CEH-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lowes Home Center, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19792139) filed by Laura A. Jurkowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Gibson, Brandon) Modified text on 7/21/2022 (SEG). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed Russell