This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:11:21 (UTC).

Julie Perrin v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Julie Perrin filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Bankers Life and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00187

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie Perrin

Defendants

Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company

CNO Financial Group, Inc.

K.F. Agency, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Bankers Life and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph M Lovretovich

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Christina Rodriguez Manalo

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Eric Meier Gruzen

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Andrew Stephen Pletcher

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

William Hays Weissman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1255 Treat Boulevard Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #4

Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition

15 #3

Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition

15 #2

Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition

15 #1

Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#13

1 #10

Declaration of Ronald Jackson

1 #9

Declaration of Nathan Richardson

1 #8

Declaration of Karl Kindig

1 #7

Exhibit F (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location)

1 #5

Exhibit D (Notice of Case Reassignment)

1 #4

Exhibit C (Notice of Case Assignment)

1 #3

Exhibit B (Civil Case Cover Sheet)

1 #2

Exhibit A (Summons & First Amended Complaint)

1 #1

Declaration of William Weissman

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal #17 , the Petition to Compel #13 is deemed moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Petition to Compel #13 is taken off the 2/21/2019 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 2/21/2019. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #13 filed by Defendant Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, K.F. Agency, Inc.. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Objection in opposition re: PETITION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Plaintiff Julie Perrin. (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Opposition in opposition re: PETITION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Plaintiff Julie Perrin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition, #3 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition, #4 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition)(Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION of Jonny Bitar in Support PETITION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, K.F. Agency, Inc.. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PETITION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, K.F. Agency, Inc. Hearing set 2/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Weissman, William) Modified on 1/25/2019 (vdr). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Memorandum in Support of Motion #10 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Incorrect event selected; and (2) There is no Motion on the docket to which this Memorandum relates. (vdr) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) *DOCUMENT STRICKEN* MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceeding filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, K.F. Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Weissman, William) Modified on 1/24/2019 (vdr). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph M Lovretovich counsel for Plaintiff Julie Perrin. Adding Andrew S. Pletcher as counsel of record for Julie Perrin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Julie Perrin. (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Julie Perrin.. (Lovretovich, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., Colonial Penn Life Insurance Company, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, K.F. Agency, Inc., filed by plaintiff Julie Perrin. (Filed in state court 12/10/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, K.F. AGENCY, INC., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 served on January 9, 2019. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, K.F. AGENCY, INC., identifying Conseco Life Insurance of Texas; CDOC, Inc.. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bankers Life and Casualty Company, CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, K.F. AGENCY, INC.. (Weissman, William) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV02900 Receipt No: 0973-23015410 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants CNO Financial Group, Inc., COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Bankers Life and Casualty Company, K.F. AGENCY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Weissman, #2 Exhibit A (Summons & First Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Civil Case Cover Sheet), #4 Exhibit C (Notice of Case Assignment), #5 Exhibit D (Notice of Case Reassignment), #6 Exhibit E (Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations), #7 Exhibit F (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location), #8 Declaration of Karl Kindig, #9 Declaration of Nathan Richardson, #10 Declaration of Ronald Jackson) (Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party Bankers Life and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party CNO Financial Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney William Hays Weissman added to party K.F. AGENCY, INC.(pty:dft))(Weissman, William) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.F. Agency, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL PENN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CNO Financial Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AN IOWA is a litigant