This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:28:46 (UTC).

Julie Flores v. AccessLex Institute et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Julie Flores filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AccessLex Institute. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07493

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie Flores

Montrose, CA 91020

Defendants

Does 1-100

Access Group Education Lending

AccessLex Institute doing business as Access Group doing business as Access Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Marcos Daniel Sasso

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#12

(#12) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number 20GDCV00378. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AccessLex Institute, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on August 19, 2020. (Sasso, Marcos) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 . Document # 8 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk issued the Notice of Deficiencies regarding the Notice of Interested Parties in error. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#8

(#8) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/19/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas F Burke on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John C Grugan on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20GDCV00378 Receipt No: ACACDC-27697275 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Marcos Daniel Sasso added to party ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP(pty:dft))(Sasso, Marcos) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number 20GDCV00378. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AccessLex Institute, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on August 19, 2020. (Sasso, Marcos) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 . Document # 8 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk issued the Notice of Deficiencies regarding the Notice of Interested Parties in error. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/19/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas F Burke on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John C Grugan on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP, identifying no parent corporation. (Sasso, Marcos) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Access Group Education Lending, AccessLex Institute, Does 1-100. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Julie Flores. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/3/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D) (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP. (Sasso, Marcos) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20GDCV00378 Receipt No: ACACDC-27697275 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Marcos Daniel Sasso added to party ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP(pty:dft))(Sasso, Marcos) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less