This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:26:38 (UTC).

JULIAN v. INCH et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 JULIAN filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against INCH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are HOPE T CANNON and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

HOPE T CANNON

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH JULIAN

Sneads, FL 32460

Defendants

MARK INCH

JOHN DOE - 2

MS HELMS

JOHN DOE 3

WHITE

MADDOX

JOHN DOE 4

JOHN DOE 1

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER REQUIRING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or a second amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 8/12/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 7/11/2019. (form to pla) (sdw) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pure Bill of Discovery by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#11

(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Administrator of Inmate Accounts Re: #10 ORDER. (return to sender/unable to forward)(Clerk will resend order w/ letter) (sdw) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the clerk shall not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. The clerk shall MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to the Apalachee Correctional Institution. The clerk is hereby directed to refer this matter to the undersigned for preliminary screening. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 6/3/2019. (order w/ letter to Apalachee CI) (sdw) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH JULIAN. (MB) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Plaintiff's #7 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk shall send Plaintiff another complete set of forms needed for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either file the completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order.(Form and order mailed.) ( Fee due by 6/3/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 5/2/2019. (alb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#6

(#6) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE - 2, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, HELMS, MARK INCH, MADDOX, and WHITE filed by JOSEPH JULIAN. (no service copies) (sdw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauper is (ECF Doc. #2 ) isDENIED without prejudice. Clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed for filinga motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a 1983 complaint form. Plaintiff's Motion for Pure Bill of Discovery (ECF Doc. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/5/2019. (Filing Fee due by 5/6/2019.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). (MB) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Pure Bill of Discovery by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, HELMS, MARK INCH, MADDOX, and WHITE filed by JOSEPH JULIAN. (no service copies) (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REQUIRING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or a second amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 8/12/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 7/11/2019. (form to pla) (sdw) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION for Pure Bill of Discovery. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Pure Bill of Discovery by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Administrator of Inmate Accounts Re: #10 ORDER. (return to sender/unable to forward)(Clerk will resend order w/ letter) (sdw) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (sdw) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the clerk shall not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. The clerk shall MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to the Apalachee Correctional Institution. The clerk is hereby directed to refer this matter to the undersigned for preliminary screening. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 6/3/2019. (order w/ letter to Apalachee CI) (sdw) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (MB) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH JULIAN. (MB) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Plaintiff's #7 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk shall send Plaintiff another complete set of forms needed for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either file the completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order.(Form and order mailed.) ( Fee due by 6/3/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 5/2/2019. (alb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 First Amended Complaint, #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE - 2, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, HELMS, MARK INCH, MADDOX, and WHITE filed by JOSEPH JULIAN. (no service copies) (sdw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauper is (ECF Doc. #2 ) isDENIED without prejudice. Clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed for filinga motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a 1983 complaint form. Plaintiff's Motion for Pure Bill of Discovery (ECF Doc. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/5/2019. (Filing Fee due by 5/6/2019.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). (MB) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Pure Bill of Discovery, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#4) Notice to Pro Se litigant JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Pure Bill of Discovery by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH JULIAN. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, HELMS, MARK INCH, MADDOX, and WHITE filed by JOSEPH JULIAN. (no service copies) (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less