This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:59:45 (UTC).

Juerling v. Imara, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Juerling filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Imara, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John P. Cronan and Sarah L Cave. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-09986

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

Referral Judge

Sarah L Cave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosemarie Juerling

Defendants

Imara, Inc.

David M. Mott

Rahul D. Ballal

David Bonita

Mark Chin

Edward Conner

Barbara J. Dalton

Carl Goldfischer

Laura A. Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan J. Smith

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith, L.L.C.

240 Mineola Blvd.

Mineola, NY 11501

Defendant Attorney

Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (NYC)

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich St.

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rahul D. Ballal, David Bonita, Mark Chin, Edward Conner, Barbara J. Dalton, Carl Goldfischer, Imara, Inc., David M. Mott, Laura A. Williams. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27000776)Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IMARA, INC., DAVID M. MOTT, RAHUL D. BALLAL, DAVID BONITA, MARK CHIN, EDWARD CONNER, BARBARA J. DALTON, CARL GOLDFISCHER, and LAURA A. WILLIAMS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rahul D. Ballal, David Bonita, Mark Chin, Edward Conner, Barbara J. Dalton, Carl Goldfischer, Imara, Inc., David M. Mott, Laura A. Williams..(pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rahul D. Ballal waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; David Bonita waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Mark Chin waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Edward Conner waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Barbara J. Dalton waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Carl Goldfischer waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Imara, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; David M. Mott waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Laura A. Williams waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans on behalf of Imara, Inc...(Kaplan-Marans, Tamar) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/4/2023) (jca) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Rahul D. Ballal, David Bonita, Mark Chin, Edward Conner, Barbara J. Dalton, Carl Goldfischer, Imara, Inc., David M. Mott, Laura A. Williams. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Notice is hereby given that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff Rosemarie Juerling ("Plaintiff") voluntarily dismisses this action without prejudice. This notice of dismissal is being filed before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's dismissal of this Action is effective upon filing of this notice. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) (1)(A)(i), a plaintiff may file a notice of dismissal to dismiss an action without a court order prior to the opposing party serving an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/20/2023) (ama) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Notice is hereby given that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff Rosemarie Juerling ("Plaintiff") voluntarily dismisses this action without prejudice. This notice of dismissal is being filed before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's dismissal of this Action is effective upon filing of this notice. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) (1)(A)(i), a plaintiff may file a notice of dismissal to dismiss an action without a court order prior to the opposing party serving an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/20/2023) (ama) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Rahul D. Ballal, David Bonita, Mark Chin, Edward Conner, Barbara J. Dalton, Carl Goldfischer, Imara, Inc., David M. Mott, Laura A. Williams. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/4/2023) (jca) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans on behalf of Imara, Inc...(Kaplan-Marans, Tamar) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rahul D. Ballal waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; David Bonita waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Mark Chin waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Edward Conner waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Barbara J. Dalton waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Carl Goldfischer waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Imara, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; David M. Mott waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Laura A. Williams waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rahul D. Ballal, David Bonita, Mark Chin, Edward Conner, Barbara J. Dalton, Carl Goldfischer, Imara, Inc., David M. Mott, Laura A. Williams..(pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IMARA, INC., DAVID M. MOTT, RAHUL D. BALLAL, DAVID BONITA, MARK CHIN, EDWARD CONNER, BARBARA J. DALTON, CARL GOLDFISCHER, and LAURA A. WILLIAMS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rahul D. Ballal, David Bonita, Mark Chin, Edward Conner, Barbara J. Dalton, Carl Goldfischer, Imara, Inc., David M. Mott, Laura A. Williams. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27000776)Document filed by Rosemarie Juerling..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans