This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 07:33:41 (UTC).

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 JUDICIAL WATCH, INC filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03433

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

Defendant

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE

1401 Constitution Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20230

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul J. Orfanedes

Attorney at JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

425 Third Street, Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Patrick Schaefer

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #3

Summons U.S. Attorney General

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

5 #1

Declaration of Cristina Rotaru

1 #4

Summons U.S. Department of Commerce

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562761) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Commerce)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/15/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 21, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before January 13, 2020, a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents, and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/26/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/15/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562761) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Commerce)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.