This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 08:23:48 (UTC).

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 JUDICIAL WATCH, INC filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03088

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

Defendant

NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul J. Orfanedes

Attorney at JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

425 Third Street, Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Meredith Leigh Di Liberto

Attorney at JUDICIAL WATCH

425 Third Street Sw, Suite 800

Upper Holland, DC 20024

Defendant Attorney

Amy E. Powell

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OFJ USTICE

150 Fayetteville St, Ste 2100

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

8 #1

Declaration of David Rothstein

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 11/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

7 #1

Declaration of David Rothstein

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

6 #1

Declaration of David Rothstein

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Leigh Di Liberto on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01729-TJK. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

1 #5

Summons for National Security Agency

1 #4

Summons for US Attorney General

1 #3

Summons for US Attorney for DC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 11/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Leigh Di Liberto on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01729-TJK. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7762930) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for US Attorney for DC, #4 Summons for US Attorney General, #5 Summons for National Security Agency)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less