This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2022 at 07:20:18 (UTC).

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 JUDICIAL WATCH, INC filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02841

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

Defendant

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Bekesha

Defendant Attorney

Laurel H. Lum

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security

1 #3

Summons U.S. Attorney General

1 #4

Summons U.S. Attorney

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

(#4) STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 29, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Affidavit Brooke Paz

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 13, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 14, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 20, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 29, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9530478) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 9/20/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less