This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:02:33 (UTC).

Judge v. State of California et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Judge filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-07018

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santokn Judge

Defendants

State of California

Governor Gavin Newsom

County of Santa Clara

Sara H. Cody

City of Sunnyvale

Kent Steffens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Alan Otto

Attorney at Law Office of James A. Otto

19536 San Jose Street

Northridge, CA 91326

Defendant Attorneys

Xavier Mark Brandwajn

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Anais Martinez Aquino

Attorney at City of Sunnyvale, Office of the City Attorney

456 W. Olive Ave.

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

John Albert Nagel

Attorney at Ofc City Attorney

456 West Olive Avenue

Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3707

Margaret Wieland Rosequist

Attorney at Meyers Nave

707 Wilshire Blvd., 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Matthew Bryan Nazareth

Attorney at Meyers Nave

707 Wilshire Boulevard, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Deborah J. Fox

Attorney at Meyers Nave Riback Silver & Wilson

555 12Th Street, Suite 1500

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Santa Clara and Sarah H. Cody, MD, MPH ) filed bySara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#15

(#15) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) City of Sunnyvale and City Manager Kent Steffens' Non-Opposition Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byCity of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

14 #3

Exhibit C

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/1/2021. Replies due by 10/8/2021. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#12

(#12) Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Santa Clara and Sarah H. Cody, MD, MPH Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed bySara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Santa Clara and Sarah H. Cody, MD, MPH filed by Sara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/1/2021. Replies due by 10/8/2021. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

10 #1

Supplement

#10

#8

#7

#3

2 #2

Exhibit Exhs 11-24 to Exh A

2 #1

Exhibit Exhs 1 - 10 to Exh A

#2

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Santa Clara and Sarah H. Cody, MD, MPH ) filed bySara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) City of Sunnyvale and City Manager Kent Steffens' Non-Opposition Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byCity of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Judicial Notice re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCity of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/1/2021. Replies due by 10/8/2021. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Santa Clara and Sarah H. Cody, MD, MPH Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed bySara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Santa Clara and Sarah H. Cody, MD, MPH filed by Sara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/1/2021. Replies due by 10/8/2021. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102] In Future--please attach Civil Cover Sheet to Removal #1 and attach Exhibits to Removal #1 File as single do cket entry. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Exhibits filed by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens, #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#9) Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara re #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #6 Joinder (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara.. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal by Sara H. Cody, County of Santa Clara. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens re #1 Notice of Removal TO ADVERSE PARTIES (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens re #1 Notice of Removal (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by City of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens . (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBITS re #1 Notice of Removal Exhibit A filed byCity of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs 1 - 10 to Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exhs 11-24 to Exh A)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 21CV383805. (). Filed byCity of Sunnyvale, Kent Steffens. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Gavin Newsom is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Xavier M. Brandwajn Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Nazareth Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah J. Fox Esquire