This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 11:34:39 (UTC).

Juarez v. Kroger Co. et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Juarez filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josie Juarez

Houston, TX 77005

Defendants

Kroger Co.

Kroger Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Russell Roberts

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Kelsi Michelle Wade

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr & Smith

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Adraon DelJohn Greene

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr And Smith

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Josie Juarez, filed.(Roberts, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Co., Kroger Texas LP, filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit D-4

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit D-3

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit D-2

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D-1

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25662041) filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#5) ***Docketed In Error***(JessicaVillarreal, 3). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Josie Juarez, filed.(Roberts, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Co., Kroger Texas LP, filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25662041) filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin R. Roberts