This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:46:45 (UTC).

JTH Tax, LLC et al v. Daniels et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 JTH Tax, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Daniels. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01683

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SiempreTax+ LLC

JTH Tax, LLC

JTH Tax, LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service

Defendants

Tax Services Plus

Patty Daniels

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan D Pearman

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Kirstie Morgan Simmerman

Attorney at Gordon Rees et al

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

7 #15

Exhibit M

7 #14

Exhibit L

7 #13

Exhibit K

7 #12

Exhibit J

7 #11

Exhibit I

7 #10

Exhibit H

7 #9

Exhibit G

7 #8

Exhibit F

7 #7

Exhibit E

7 #6

Exhibit D

7 #5

Exhibit C

7 #4

Exhibit B

7 #3

Exhibit A

7 #2

Affidavit Declaration of C. Dawson

7 #1

Affidavit Declaration of G. Chelliah

#7

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER on #7 Preliminary Injunction (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed.(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempreTax LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Pearman, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempreTax LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of G. Chelliah, #2 Affidavit Declaration of C. Dawson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstie M. Simmerman on behalf of JTH Tax, LLC, SiempreTax LLC, filed. (Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Patty Daniels, Tax Services Plus, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons to Tax Services Plus)(Pearman, Nathan) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Patty Daniels, Tax Services Plus (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24660295) filed by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempreTax LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Pearman, Nathan) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siempretax, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JTH Tax LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service is a litigant

Latest cases where JTH TAX, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Liberty Tax Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan D Pearman