This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2021 at 10:11:11 (UTC).

JTH Tax, LLC et al v. Santoyo et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 JTH Tax, LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Santoyo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03914

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIEMPRETAX + LLC

JTH TAX, LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE

JTH Tax, LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service

SiempreTax LLC

Defendants

LTS MULTISERVICE, LLC

OSCAR LOPEZ

MARIA DEL CARMEN SANTOYO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirstie Morgan Simmerman

Attorney at Gordon Rees et al

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

3 #2

Continuation

3 #1

Continuation

#3

#2

1 #12

Exhibit K

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maria Del Carmen Santoyo served on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Oscar Lopez served on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LTS Multiservice, LLC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021, filed.(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25523143) filed by JTH TAX, LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE, SIEMPRETAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gary Chelliah Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siempretax, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JTH Tax LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service is a litigant

Latest cases where JTH TAX, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Liberty Tax Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirstie Morgan Simmerman