This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 06:35:03 (UTC).

JTH Tax, Inc. et al v. Abikarram et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 JTH Tax, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Abikarram. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick M. Hunt and Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-60328

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

JTH Tax, Inc. d/b/a Liberty Tax Service

Siempretax, LLC

JTH Tax, Inc.

JTH Tax, Inc. doing business as Liberty Tax Service

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Freedom Tax Services, LLC, d/b/a Freedom Tax Center

Jesus Abikarram

Lourdes Abikarram

Income Tax Prep Corp.

Freedom Tax Services, LLC

Freedom Tax Services, LLC doing business as Freedom Tax Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Capri Trigo

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

100 Se Second Street, Suite 3900

Miami, FL 33131

Patrick K. Burns

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

1300 I St., Nw, Suite 825

Washington, DC 20005

Peter George Siachos

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Adam Gruder Wasch

Attorney at Wasch Raines LLP

2500 N. Military Trail, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Evan M. Goldman

Attorney at A.Y. Strauss LLC

101 Eisenhower Parkway, Suite 412

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) OBJECTIONS to #47 Report and Recommendations and Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Jesus Abikarram, Lourdes Abikarram, Freedom Tax Services, LLC, Income Tax Prep Corp.. (Wasch, Adam) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

53 #1

Affidavit

#47

(#47) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction recommending the Motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 3/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (hhr) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

14 #13

Exhibit K

14 #12

Exhibit J

14 #8

Exhibit F

14 #3

Exhibit A

14 #2

Affidavit of Jay Canaday

14 #1

Affidavit of Adam Berger

1 #15

Summon(s) Freedom Tax Service, LLC

1 #14

Summon(s) Lourdes Abikarram

1 #13

Summon(s) Income Tax Prep Corp.

1 #12

Summon(s) Jesus Abikarram

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) OBJECTIONS to #47 Report and Recommendations and Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Jesus Abikarram, Lourdes Abikarram, Freedom Tax Services, LLC, Income Tax Prep Corp.. (Wasch, Adam) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) RESPONSE to #47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by JTH Tax, Inc., Siempretax, LLC Recommending grant. by JTH Tax, Inc., Siempretax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Trigo, Capri) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against JTH Tax, Inc., Siempretax, LLC by Income Tax Prep Corp., Jesus Abikarram, Freedom Tax Services, LLC, Lourdes Abikarram. (Wasch, Adam) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER of Referral to Mediation ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2019 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) SCHEDULING ORDER for Pretrial Conference and Trial : Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2019. Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Expert Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2019. Motions due by 9/6/2019. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 10/23/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2019 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #48 Order Referring Case to Mediation, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/27/2019. (gco) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER of Referral to Mediation., ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction recommending the Motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 3/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (hhr) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER denying #44 Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order ; denying as moot #26 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by JTH Tax, Inc., Siempretax, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trigo, Capri) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JTH Tax, Inc., Siempretax, LLC. Income Tax Prep Corp. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Trigo, Capri) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JTH Tax, Inc., Siempretax, LLC. Jesus Abikarram served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Trigo, Capri) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Setting Initial Planning And Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/15/2019 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Jesus Abikarram, Lourdes Abikarram, Freedom Tax Services, LLC, Income Tax Prep Corp.. (vmz) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (vmz) Modified file date on 2/7/2019 (vmz). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jesus Abikarram, Lourdes Abikarram, Freedom Tax Services, LLC, d/b/a Freedom Tax Center, Income Tax Prep Corp.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11374617, filed by JTH Tax, Inc. d/b/a Liberty Tax Service, Siempretax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summon(s) Jesus Abikarram, #13 Summon(s) Income Tax Prep Corp., #14 Summon(s) Lourdes Abikarram, #15 Summon(s) Freedom Tax Service, LLC)(Trigo, Capri) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JTH TAX, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Liberty Tax Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter George Siachos