This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:04:16 (UTC).

JSB Farms, LLC v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 JSB Farms, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer Cropscience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JSB Farms, LLC

Defendants

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Corteva, Inc.

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Syngenta Corporation

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

CHS Inc.

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Growmark FS, LLC

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna-Patrice Harris

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Christopher Young

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP

601 California Street, Ste 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr.

Attorney at REINHARDT AND WENDORF

332 Minnesota Street, Suite E-1250

St. Paul, MN 55101

Joseph R Saveri

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP

601 California St., Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Roberta A Yard

Attorney at REINHARDT AND WENDORF

332 Minnesota Street, Suite E-1250

St. Paul, MN 55101

Steven N. Williams

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

#14

14 #1

*Restricted*

#24

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SEP et al.(Echols, Barack) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-01333. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.(kt) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anna-Patrice Harris for JSB Farms, LLC; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven N. Williams for JSB Farms, LLC; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph R Saveri for JSB Farms, LLC; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Young for JSB Farms, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/11/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher K.L. Young. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8804958 filed by JSB Farms, LLC. (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph R. Saveri. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8804954 filed by JSB Farms, LLC. (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven N. Williams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8804943 filed by JSB Farms, LLC. (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anna-Patrice Harris. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8804937 filed by JSB Farms, LLC. (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff JSB Farms, LLC. (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Doty, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1333 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge David S. Doty on 6/7/2021.(MMP) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Joseph R. Saveri, Steven N. Williams, Anna-Patrice Makeba Harris, Christopher K.L. Young as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to CHS Inc., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Tenkoz, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives LTD, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (CLK) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1333 DSD/BRT. (CLK) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8797415) filed by JSB Farms, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant