This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:23:14 (UTC).

JRH & Associates, LLC et al v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 JRH Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Twin City Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Callie V. S. Granade and Bert W. Milling, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Callie V. S. Granade

Referral Judge

Bert W. Milling, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JRH & Associates, LLC

Frazier Splicing & Construction, Inc

Defendants

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis Inge Johnstone

Attorney at Johnstone Carroll LLC

2204 Lakeshore Drive, Suite 303

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorney

Christina May Bolin

Attorney at Christian & Small, LLP

One Timber Way, Suite 101

Daphne, AL 36527

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Twin City Fire Insurance Company.. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

13 #1

consent form

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Sample Disclosure Statement e-mailed to Defendants The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Twin City Fire Insurance Company; Disclosure Statements Due 2/16/2022. (mab) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#11

(#11) Hartford Casualty Ins. Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#10

(#10) Hartford Ins. Co. of the Midwest ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) Twin City Fire Ins. Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Frazier Splicing & Construction, Inc. (Johnstone, Francis) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff JRH & Associates, LLC. (Johnstone, Francis) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Service Notice issued 1/18/2022. Plaintiffs' notice of service attempts due by 2/28/2022 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(a)(3). (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Summonses Issued as to Twin City Fire Insurance Company, The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, and The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 filed by The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #14 filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 filed by The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Milling, Bert) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 filed by The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #14 filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 filed by The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (APG) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Twin City Fire Insurance Company.. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 2/9/2022. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Sample Disclosure Statement e-mailed to Defendants The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Twin City Fire Insurance Company; Disclosure Statements Due 2/16/2022. (mab) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Hartford Casualty Ins. Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Hartford Ins. Co. of the Midwest ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Twin City Fire Ins. Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Bolin, Christina) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by JRH & Associates, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Frazier Splicing & Construction, Inc (Milling, Bert) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by JRH & Associates, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Frazier Splicing & Construction, Inc (APG) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Frazier Splicing & Construction, Inc. (Johnstone, Francis) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff JRH & Associates, LLC. (Johnstone, Francis) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Service Notice issued 1/18/2022. Plaintiffs' notice of service attempts due by 2/28/2022 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(a)(3). (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued as to Twin City Fire Insurance Company, The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, and The Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sample Disclosure Statement e-mailed to Plaintiffs Frazier Splicing & Construction, Inc, JRH & Associates, LLC; Disclosure Statement Due 1/21/2022 pursuant to Civil L.R. 7.1(a). (Counsel: please identify the individual members of JRH & Associates, LLC.) (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2944640, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Johnstone, Francis) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases where TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina May Bolin