Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2019 at 19:25:36 (UTC).

JPT Group, LLC v. Tory Burch LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 JPT Group, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tory Burch LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew S Hanen and George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02040

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andrew S Hanen

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

JPT Group, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Tory Burch LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

J. Reid Bumgarner

Attorney at Port & Bumgarner LLP

6750 West Loop South, Ste 748

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Natalie L Arbaugh

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2501 N. Harwood, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

William M Logan

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1111 Louisiana St, 25Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) REPLY in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c), filed by Tory Burch LLC. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

30 #1

Proposed Order

#30

(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c), filed by JPT Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#29

(#29) PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#28

(#28) PATENT CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Compliance with PR 3-1 and PR 3-2 due by 11/21/2019; Compliance with PR 3-3 due by 12/19/2019; Compliance with PR 4-1 due by 1/9/2020; Compliance with PR 4-2 due by 1/30/2020; Compliance with PR 4-3 due by 3/5/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2020; Response to Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2020; Technical Advisors Information due by 4/9/2020 Discovery - Claim Construction due by 3/19/2020; Compliance with PR 4-5(a) due by 4/23/2020 Compliance with PR 4-5(b) due by 5/7/2020 Compliance with PR 4-5(c) due by 5/14/2020; Claim Construction Chart due by 6/11/2020; Markman Hearing set for 6/18/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 9B before Judge George C Hanks Jr.; Mediation to be completed three months after Markman ruling; Decision on Claim Construction due by 7/30/2020; Final Infringement Contentions due by 8/13/2020; Final Invalidity Contentions due by 8/27/2020; Compliance with PR 3-8 due by 8/13/2020; Pltf Expert Report due by 9/10/2020; Deft Expert Report due by 10/8/2020; Discovery due by 12/3/2020; Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/14/2021; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/14/2021; Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2021; Request for Daily Transcript due by 4/8/2021; Video & Deposition Designation due by 4/8/2021; Motions in Limine due by 4/8/2021; Objections due by 4/15/2021; Advisory due by 5/6/2021; Docket Call set for 5/7/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr)Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for June/July 2021. Jury Grial Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#27

(#27) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 11/1/2019.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

(#26) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c) by Tory Burch LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

24 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPT Group, LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Tory Burch LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tory Burch LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Patent No. D581149

1 #1

Exhibit Patent No. D577182

#1

(#26) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c) by Tory Burch LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c), filed by Tory Burch LLC. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c), filed by JPT Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) PATENT CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Compliance with PR 3-1 and PR 3-2 due by 11/21/2019; Compliance with PR 3-3 due by 12/19/2019; Compliance with PR 4-1 due by 1/9/2020; Compliance with PR 4-2 due by 1/30/2020; Compliance with PR 4-3 due by 3/5/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2020; Response to Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2020; Technical Advisors Information due by 4/9/2020 Discovery - Claim Construction due by 3/19/2020; Compliance with PR 4-5(a) due by 4/23/2020 Compliance with PR 4-5(b) due by 5/7/2020 Compliance with PR 4-5(c) due by 5/14/2020; Claim Construction Chart due by 6/11/2020; Markman Hearing set for 6/18/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 9B before Judge George C Hanks Jr.; Mediation to be completed three months after Markman ruling; Decision on Claim Construction due by 7/30/2020; Final Infringement Contentions due by 8/13/2020; Final Invalidity Contentions due by 8/27/2020; Compliance with PR 3-8 due by 8/13/2020; Pltf Expert Report due by 9/10/2020; Deft Expert Report due by 10/8/2020; Discovery due by 12/3/2020; Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/14/2021; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/14/2021; Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2021; Request for Daily Transcript due by 4/8/2021; Video & Deposition Designation due by 4/8/2021; Motions in Limine due by 4/8/2021; Objections due by 4/15/2021; Advisory due by 5/6/2021; Docket Call set for 5/7/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr)Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for June/July 2021. Jury Grial Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on November 7, 2019. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances: J. Reid Bumgarner and William M Logan. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 11/1/2019.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Under Rule 12(c) by Tory Burch LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Tory Burch LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan by Tory Burch LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Resetting as to start time re: #16 Notice of Setting/Resetting FORM - CV. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 11/7/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against JPT Group, LLC by Tory Burch LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USD495855, #2 Exhibit B - USD496147, #3 Exhibit C - EM700000000660592-0019, #4 Exhibit D - EM700000000638010-0006)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Tory Burch LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by JPT Group, LLC, filed. (Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPT Group, LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Tory Burch LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tory Burch LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Tory Burch LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22563133) filed by JPT Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent No. D577182, #2 Exhibit Patent No. D581149)(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPT Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TORY BURCH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie L. Arbaugh