This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 07:38:58 (UTC).

JPT Group, LLC v. Sugartown Worldwide LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 JPT Group, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sugartown Worldwide LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02043

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

JPT Group, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Sugartown Worldwide LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

J. Reid Bumgarner

Attorney at Port & Bumgarner LLP

6750 West Loop South, Ste 748

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Nicholas Joseph Nieto

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend et al

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 4300

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Michael Bertelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Michael Turton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sugartown Worldwide LLC identifying Oxford Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

9 #2

Exhibit Ex. B to Counterclaim

9 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to Counterclaim

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against JPT Group, LLC by Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Counterclaim)(Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sugartown Worldwide LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by JPT Group, LLC, filed. (Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPT Group, LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit US Patent No. D581149

1 #1

Exhibit US Patent No. D577182

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sugartown Worldwide LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22563451) filed by JPT Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent No. D577182, #2 Exhibit US Patent No. D581149)(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Michael Bertelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Michael Turton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sugartown Worldwide LLC identifying Oxford Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against JPT Group, LLC by Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Counterclaim)(Nieto, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sugartown Worldwide LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by JPT Group, LLC, filed. (Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPT Group, LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Sugartown Worldwide LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sugartown Worldwide LLC, filed.(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sugartown Worldwide LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22563451) filed by JPT Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent No. D577182, #2 Exhibit US Patent No. D581149)(Bumgarner, J.) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPT Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sugartown Worldwide LLC is a litigant