This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 09:07:09 (UTC).

JPJ Services LLC v.Federal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 JPJ Services LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth A. Marra and Shaniek M. Maynard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-14052

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth A. Marra

Referral Judge

Shaniek M. Maynard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JPJ SERVICES, LLC A/A/O OLIN BROWNE AND PAMELA BROWNE

JPJ Services LLC

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA CHUBB

Federal Insurance Company doing business as Chubb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Aaron Whisler

1909 Tyler Street, #502

Hollywood, FL 33020

Andrea Michele Franklin

Attorney at The Whisler Law Firm

1909 Tyler St, Ste 501

Boca Raton, FL 33020

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Michael Holober

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4410

Miami, FL 33131

John David Dickenson

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One North Clematis Street, Suite 510

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 2/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference And Order Requiring Joint Discovery Status Report, ( Status Report due by 11/8/2021., Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 11/10/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 3/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/5/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 7/1/2022 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#6

(#6) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Federal Insurance Company (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Federal Insurance Company. (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Evan Michael Holober (Holober, Evan) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14320937, filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA CHUBB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Holober, Evan) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified text on 2/2/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 2/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference And Order Requiring Joint Discovery Status Report, ( Status Report due by 11/8/2021., Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 11/10/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 3/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/5/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 7/1/2022 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Federal Insurance Company (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Federal Insurance Company. (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Evan Michael Holober (Holober, Evan) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14320937, filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA CHUBB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Holober, Evan) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified text on 2/2/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPJ SERVICES LLC A/A/O AUSTIN DOWNING AND LEEANDRA SULLIVAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Aaron Whisler