This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:22:13 (UTC).

In Re: TK Holdings Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 In Re TK Holdings Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00896

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellant

Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC

Debtor

TK Holdings Inc., et al.

Appellee

Automotive Coalition For Traffic Safety, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michael Jason Barrie

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

1313 North Market Street, Ste 1201

Wilmington, DE 19801

Matthew D. Beebe

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

1313 North Market Street, Ste 1201

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Sally Elaine Veghte

Attorney at Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers

919 Market Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard M. Beck, Jr.

Attorney at Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers

919 Market Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2020. (nms) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#13

(#13) SO ORDERED Granting #12 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2020. (nms) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#12

(#12) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/30/20. (cak) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

11 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

11 #1

Order of Final Judgment

#11

(#11) Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order of Final Judgment, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

9 #4

Certificate of Service

9 #3

Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) MOTION for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 and 107(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) and 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Ningbo Joyson Electronic Corp. for Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) DESIGNATION of Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beebe, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda D. Mettes - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2020. (nms) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SO ORDERED Granting #12 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2020. (nms) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/30/20. (cak) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order of Final Judgment, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 and 107(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) and 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal (D.I. #9 ) is DENIED (see "Avandia"). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 and 107(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) and 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Ningbo Joyson Electronic Corp. for Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION of Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beebe, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda D. Mettes, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC, and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/10/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda D. Mettes - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Monday, July 27, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/6/20. (cak) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 6/18/2020 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 18-50274. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less