This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:09:21 (UTC).

Joy-Sobota v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Joy-Sobota filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14123

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Joy-Sobota

Defendants

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Tarek C. Abbassi

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (clw) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8010743) filed by Susan Joy-Sobota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Susan Joy-Sobota(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (clw) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8010743) filed by Susan Joy-Sobota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Susan Joy-Sobota(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.