This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 07:41:12 (UTC).

Josh Withers v. Oak View Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Josh Withers filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Oak View Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04097

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josh Withers

Defendant

Oak View Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig B Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Bert H Deixler

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

Sarah Emily Moses

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (jp) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Josh Withers. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah Emily Moses counsel for Defendant Oak View Group, LLC. Adding Sarah E. Moses as counsel of record for Oak View Group, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Oak View Group, LLC. (Moses, Sarah) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bert H Deixler counsel for Defendant Oak View Group, LLC. Adding Bert H. Deixler as counsel of record for Oak View Group, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Oak View Group, LLC. (Attorney Bert H Deixler added to party Oak View Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Deixler, Bert) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Oak View Group, LLC answer now due 7/8/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Oak View Group, LLC.(Attorney Sarah Emily Moses added to party Oak View Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Moses, Sarah) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josh Withers, upon Defendant Oak View Group, LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Oak View Group, LLC. (et) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Josh Withers, identifying Barshay Sanders, PLLC, Craig B. Sanders, Oak View Group, LLC. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Josh Withers. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Josh Withers. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Josh Withers. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31304803 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Josh Withers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Josh Withers(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oak View Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig B. Sanders