This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2020 at 09:18:14 (UTC).

JOSEPH v. VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 JOSEPH filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald L. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24742

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald L. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KESLINE JOSEPH

Defendant

VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tiffani-Ruth Imani Brooks

Defendant Attorney

Arianne Bombalier Suarez

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC. Attorney Arianne Bombalier Suarez added to party VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC(pty:dft). (Suarez, Arianne) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by KESLINE JOSEPH. VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (kpe) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Defendant's name and address not provided. (kpe) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VPNE PARKING SOLUTIONS, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12152160, filed by KESLINE JOSEPH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less