This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2020 at 08:11:19 (UTC).

Stutes v. Tesco Offshore Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Stutes filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Tesco Offshore Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Eldon E. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14146

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stutes Joseph, Jr.

Joseph Stutes, Jr.

Defendants

Shell Offshore, Inc.

Nabors Offshore Corporation

Shell Energy Resources Company

Noble Drilling Exploration Company

Shell Exploration & Production Company

Shell Gulf of Mexico, Inc.

Shell International Exploration & Production, Inc

NOBLE DRILLING (U.S.) LLC

Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc.

Shell Chemical LP

Shell Energy North America (US), L.P.

Noble Energy, Inc.

Tesco Offshore Services, LLC

Noble Drilling U.S. LLC

Shell Energy North America US, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grady Jonathan Flattmann

Robert V. Reech

Henry T. Dart

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

#5

4 #12

Summons

4 #11

Summons

4 #10

Summons

4 #9

Summons

4 #8

Summons

4 #7

Summons

4 #6

Summons

4 #5

Summons

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mp) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Offshore Corporation, Noble Drilling Exploration Company, Noble Drilling U.S. LLC, Shell Chemical LP, Shell Energy North America US, L.P., Shell Energy Resources Company, Shell Exploration & Production Company, Shell Gulf of Mexico, Inc., Shell International Exploration & Production, Inc, Shell Offshore, Inc., Tesco Offshore Services, LLC filed by Joseph Stutes, Jr.(Flattmann, Grady) Modified text on 1/10/2020 (mp). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without as to Noble Energy, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Flattmann, Grady) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Nabors Drilling Technologies USA, Inc., Nabors Offshore Corporation, Noble Drilling Exploration Company, Noble Drilling U.S. LLC, Noble Energy, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Shell Energy North America US, L.P., Shell Energy Resources Company, Shell Exploration & Production Company, Shell Gulf of Mexico, Inc., Shell International Exploration & Production, Inc, Shell Offshore, Inc., Tesco Offshore Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney uploaded document with incorrect caption. Correct document subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached as the Main Document. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Joseph Stutes, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)Attorney Grady Jonathan Flattmann added to party Joseph Stutes, Jr (pty:pla).(Flattmann, Grady) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/10/2019) (jeg). Modified text on 12/10/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less