This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 12:37:35 (UTC).

Joseph v Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Joseph filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03390

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LaJean J. Joseph

Defendant

Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. doing business as Boomtown Belle Casino Westbank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Franklin G. Shaw

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Marcus Adam Green

Attorney at Green Law Firm

931 Westwood Dr., Suite B

Marrero, LA 70072

Walter John Leger, III

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Matthew Landry

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Walter John Leger, Jr.

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew W. Pryor

Attorney at Pujol, Pryor, & Irwin

12320 Highway 44, Suite C, Bldg. 4

Gonzales, LA 70737

Ashley Renee Delaune

Attorney at Pujol, Pryor & Irwin, LLC

12320 Hwy 44, Ste Building 4, Suite C

Gonzales, LA 70737

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

State Court Pleadings

1 #4

State Court Pleadings

1 #3

State Court Pleadings

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Penn National Gaming, Inc. for Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. (Delaune, Ashley) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. 3 day Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 8/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(bwn) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Strike #7 Motion to Continue Preliminary Conference filed by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/14/2021.(sbs) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Strike #7 Motion to Continue Preliminary Conference, by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pryor, Matthew) Modified text on 1/12/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pryor, Matthew) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.(Pryor, Matthew) Modified text, added link on 12/28/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. to #1 Notice of Removal. (Pryor, Matthew) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. (lt) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 811-703 Div. A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8643078) filed by Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 State Court Pleadings) Attorney Matthew W. Pryor added to party Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft).(Pryor, Matthew) Modified text on 12/15/2020 (lt). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley Renee Delaune