This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 07:49:25

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Joseph against Johnson Johnson in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-17164
  • Filing Date 08/23/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Other Product Liability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Lois H. Goodman
  • Courthouse New Jersey District

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Audrey Joseph
  • Represented By
    • Jennifer Ann Lenze
  • Defendant JOHNSON & JOHNSON
  • Represented By
    • Michael F Healy
    • Michael Carl Zellers
    • Amanda Villalobos
  • Defendant JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.
  • Represented By
    • Michael F Healy
    • Michael Carl Zellers
    • Amanda Villalobos
  • In Re JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jer...

Free with Subscription
16 #1

*Restricted*

Fees Apply
#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JO...

Fees Apply
#11

(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate ...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johns...

Fees Apply
#16

(#16) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, ...

Fees Apply
#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING...

Fees Apply
#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a propor...

Fees Apply
10 #1

Envelope

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) NOTICE of Related Actions by John Beisner. (Attachment...

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff an...

Fees Apply
13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#16) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-04375. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#15) MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/8/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
  • 08/06/2019
  • (#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson & Johnson.. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
  • 08/06/2019
  • (#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE of Related Actions by John Beisner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#8) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/19/2019. Replies due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Suport of Motion to Stay All Proceedings, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay All Proceedings)(Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 08/01/2019
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
  • 08/01/2019
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Notice of Removal, Declaration of Emily Weissenberger, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Pendency and Certificate of Interested Parties (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rule 3-13 (Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-19-577114. (No Process)(Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13568141). Filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Weissenberger in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.