This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 09:46:46 (UTC).

Joseph v. Bank of America et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Joseph filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Bank of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harold L. Murphy and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harold L. Murphy

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasel Joseph

Douglasville, GA 30133-9998

Defendants

Smith, Ronick & Corbin, LLC also known as Smith, Cavin & Corbin, LLC doing business as Smith, Cavin & Corbin, LLC

Bank of America

Neighborhood Assistance-Corporation of America

Smith, Cavin & Corbin, LLC

Vista Title Company

Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones, PLLC

United General Title Insurance Company

Bac Home Loans ISAOA ATIMA No 76161

Aldridge Pite LLP

Does 1-20

First American Title Company

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Corrected Main Document

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMMERCIAL AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT against Aldridge Pite LLP, Bac Home Loans ISAOA ATIMA No 76161, Bank of America, Does 1-20, First American Title Company, Neighborhood Assistance-Corporation of America, Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones, PLLC, Smith, Ronick & Corbin, LLC, United General Title Insurance Company, Vista Title Company filed by Jasel Joseph.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jpa). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aldridge Pite LLP, Bac Home Loans ISAOA ATIMA No 76161, Bank of America, Does 1-20, First American Title Company, Neighborhood Assistance-Corporation of America, Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones, PLLC, Smith, Ronick & Corbin, LLC, United General Title Insurance Company, Vista Title Company filed by Jasel Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/23/2021)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR NOTICE Of Filing Amended Affidavit to by Jasel Joseph re #5 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jpa) Modified on 11/23/2021 (jpa). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

5 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #3

Letter

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jasel Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; however, process will not issue at this time. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint setting forth the facts supporting his claims, as discussed above, within 21 DAYS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after 21 DAYS or upon the filing of the amended complaint, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/1/21. (jpa) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMMERCIAL AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT against Aldridge Pite LLP, Bac Home Loans ISAOA ATIMA No 76161, Bank of America, Does 1-20, First American Title Company, Neighborhood Assistance-Corporation of America, Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones, PLLC, Smith, Ronick & Corbin, LLC, United General Title Insurance Company, Vista Title Company filed by Jasel Joseph.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jpa). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #7 Amended Complaint and #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jpa) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aldridge Pite LLP, Bac Home Loans ISAOA ATIMA No 76161, Bank of America, Does 1-20, First American Title Company, Neighborhood Assistance-Corporation of America, Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones, PLLC, Smith, Ronick & Corbin, LLC, United General Title Insurance Company, Vista Title Company filed by Jasel Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR NOTICE Of Filing Amended Affidavit to by Jasel Joseph re #5 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jpa) Modified on 11/23/2021 (jpa). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jasel Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jasel Joseph re #4 Order (jpa) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; however, process will not issue at this time. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint setting forth the facts supporting his claims, as discussed above, within 21 DAYS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after 21 DAYS or upon the filing of the amended complaint, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/1/21. (jpa) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jpa) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jasel Joseph re #3 Order of Recusal. (klb) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:21-cv-186-HLM-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/5/21. (klb) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Replacement page 11 to Complaint by Jasel Joseph re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dob) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jasel Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED GENERAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTANCE CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aldridge Pite, LLP is a litigant