This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 11:05:49 (UTC).

Jose Estrada v. Kodimer Investments, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Jose Estrada filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Kodimer Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05400

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Estrada

Defendants

Does 1-10

Hafsa Corporation

Kodimer Investments, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Mohamad Saleh Ahmad

Attorney at Kermani LLP

2719 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 200

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Robert Michael Collum

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

Marc A Collins

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

Simran K Grewal

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3424 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

Azim Khanmohamed

Attorney at Collins and Khan LLP

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2246

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #1

Declaration Declaration Re Good Cause in Support of Second Application to Stay

#18

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 8:00 AM. Court Trial set for 5/11/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on August 24, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation).The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 14, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 18, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hafsa Corporation, identifying Hafsa Corporation. (Ahmad, Mohamad) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Text Entry Order: Court's response to the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #21 . Certificate of Interested parties is a MANDATORY FILING. Counsel shall file immediately to avoid striking of Answer #20 .THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 - 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Jose Estrada.. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hafsa Corporation.(Ahmad, Mohamad) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: denying #18 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Hafsa Corporation. (lom) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Second APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Hafsa Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Re Good Cause in Support of Second Application to Stay) (Ahmad, Mohamad) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge John F. Walter: re #16 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation. (et) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Estrada, upon Defendant Hafsa Corporation served on 7/5/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeanie shalabi the receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Estrada, upon Defendant Kodimer Investments, LLC served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Leland Reicher in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hafsa Corporation, Kodimer Investments, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jose Estrada. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Estrada, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Estrada. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26859996 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jose Estrada. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Jose Estrada(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HAFSA CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clive Handy