This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 14:47:22 (UTC).

Jose Caro v. Ms. Davis

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Jose Caro filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ms Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Valerie Baker Fairbank and John E. McDermott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02678

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie Baker Fairbank

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Caro

Los Angeles, CA 90086-0164

Defendant

Ms. Davis

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM)WITH CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM), ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CV21-2678-VBF (JEM), AND FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. IT IS ORDERED that CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM) be consolidated with CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM). Any future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM). The complaint in CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM) (Docket No. 1) shall be filed in as a first amended complaint in CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM), pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM) be administratively closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) INITIAL CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jose Caro. (esa) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendant Davis pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, filed by plaintiff Jose Caro. (esa) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM)WITH CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM), ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CV21-2678-VBF (JEM), AND FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. IT IS ORDERED that CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM) be consolidated with CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM). Any future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM). The complaint in CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM) (Docket No. 1) shall be filed in as a first amended complaint in CV 21-0685-VBF (JEM), pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CV 21-2678-VBF (JEM) be administratively closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jose Caro. (esa) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendant Davis pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, filed by plaintiff Jose Caro. (esa) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms Davis is a litigant