This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 08:39:24 (UTC).

Jorgenson v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Jorgenson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02145

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Jorgenson

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mac Schneider

Attorney at Schneider Schneider & Schneider

815 3Rd Ave S

Fargo, ND 58103

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/16/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only) NOTICE TO PARTIES: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per Order #5 . Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (lmb) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (lmb) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/16/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (kt) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-2145 KMM. (kt) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by John Jorgenson. (Schneider, Mac) (Entered: 10/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by John Jorgenson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schneider, Mac) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less