This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2021 at 12:41:19 (UTC).

Jorge Luis Jimenez v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Jorge Luis Jimenez filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81087

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge Luis Jimenez

Defendants

Granules India, Ltd.

Apotex Inc

Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.

Strides Pharma Global Pte. Ltd.

Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ani Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Lannett Co, Inc.

Heritage Pharma Labs Inc.

Pharma USA, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Walgreens Co.

L. Perrigo Co.

Auro Health LLC

Ranbaxy Inc

Perrigo Company PLC

Perrigo Research & Development Company

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office P.S.C.

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

#4

(#12) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#7

(#7) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#11) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01190 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81087-RLR Jorge Luis Jimenez v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 6/17/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#10) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01190. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSMITTAL Letter from the Southern District of Florida, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-65 in MDL 2924 and List of Tag-Along Actions. Their case number for this case is 20-md-02924 RLR. The Presiding Judge is Hon. Robin L. Rosenberg. This case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO, #2 List of Tag-Along Actions) (idg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL No. 2924, informing that this case forms part of CTO-65 for transfer to the Southern District of Florida and that the stay has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/7/2021. (ab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2021: #1 CTO-65, #2 Tag Along Actions) (ab). (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED ORDER re #2 MOTION to transfer case: NOTED. Counsel shall inform the Court if the Conditional Transfer Request (docket no. #2 ), was filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation at the Southern District of Florida. Once the MDL provides notice of the CTO, the case will be transferred as indicated by the MDL Panel. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 4/28/2021.(ab) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #2 Motion to transfer case: GRANTED. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the JPML and 18 U.S.C. sec. 1407, this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, to the docket of District Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, subject to her consent. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/27/2021. (brc) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (vdm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7276599.), filed by Jorge Luis Jimenez. Service due by 7/26/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Heritage Pharma Labs Inc. is a litigant