This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2020 at 08:14:05 (UTC).

Jordan v. Institute for Professional Practice

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Jordan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Institute for Professional Practice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00068

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaneshia Jordan

Defendant

Institute for Professional Practice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garlinck Dumont

Attorney at Dumont Law, LLC

1028 Boulevard

West Hartford, CT 06119

Defendant Attorney

Sarah R. Skubas

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Institute for Professional Practice.(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Institute for Professional Practice (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaneshia Jordan. Institute for Professional Practice served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Dumont, Garlinck) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Institute for Professional Practice* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Garlinck Dumont* *Dumont Law, LLC* *1028 Boulevard* *West Hartford, CT 06119*. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Shaneshia Jordan, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

5 #2

Attachment

5 #1

Attachment

#5

(#5) NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/14/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/14/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2020; Discovery due by 7/15/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/20.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Institute for Professional Practice ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CTDC-5636986.), filed by Shaneshia Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Dumont, Garlinck) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/26/2020 (Perez, J.) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Institute for Professional Practice.(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Institute for Professional Practice (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaneshia Jordan. Institute for Professional Practice served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Dumont, Garlinck) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Institute for Professional Practice* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Garlinck Dumont* *Dumont Law, LLC* *1028 Boulevard* *West Hartford, CT 06119*. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Shaneshia Jordan, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/14/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/14/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2020; Discovery due by 7/15/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/20.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketJudge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Institute for Professional Practice. (Dumont, Garlinck) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Institute for Professional Practice ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CTDC-5636986.), filed by Shaneshia Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Dumont, Garlinck) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less