This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2021 at 08:10:11 (UTC).

Jordan et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Jordan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Sunbeam Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Randall Jordan

Amy Jordan

Brooke Jordan

Defendant

Sunbeam Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George E. McLaughlin

Attorney at McLaughlin Law Firm, P.C.

1890 Gaylord Street

Denver, CO 80206

Todd F. La Neve

Attorney at La Neve Law Offices

117 1/2 Nicholas Street

Clarksburg, WV 26301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/2/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/16/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 1/13/2022. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/20/2021. (wrr) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randall Jordan, Amy Jordan, Brooke Jordan. Sunbeam Products, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sunbeam Products, Inc., filed by Randall Jordan, Amy Jordan, Brooke Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $402 PAID. Receipt #AWVNDC-3323555(wrr) Modified on 8/25/2021 to correct filing date. NEF regenerated. (wrr). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George E. McLaughlin