This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:57:49 (UTC).

Joost v. American Commercial Barge Line LLC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Joost filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against American Commercial Barge Line LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Beatty and Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A. Beatty

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy Joost

Defendant

American Commercial Barge Line LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stanley Joseph Jacobs

Attorney at Jacobs, Manuel & Kain (New Orleans)

500 St. Louis St., Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ian F. Taylor

Attorney at Lewis, Kullman , Sterbcow & Abramson

Pan American Life Bldg., 601 Poydras St., Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Paul M. Sterbcow

Attorney at Lewis, Kullman , Sterbcow & Abramson

Pan American Life Bldg., 601 Poydras St., Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jodi Jacobs Aamodt

Attorney at Jacobs, Manuel & Kain (New Orleans)

500 St. Louis St., Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen Pontier Rice

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Patrick J. McShane

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lauren A. Guichard

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Danica Benbow Denny

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

 

Court Documents

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

15 #2

Consent Brochure

15 #1

Consent to Trail By Magistrate Judge form

#15

(#15) Letter to Eastern District of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Trail By Magistrate Judge form, #2 Consent Brochure) (kdb) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #5 MOTION to to transfer venue. Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana, New Albany Division. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/8/2019.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by American Commercial Barge Line LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/2/2019. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit A-2

#8

(#8) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jeremy Joost re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5)(Taylor, Ian) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

5 #6

Proposed Order

5 #5

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren A. Guichard added to party American Commercial Barge Line LLC(pty:dft).(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • (#16) Docket Annotation per notification from the Eastern District of Louisiana case incorrectly transferred. Case should have been transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (kdb) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Letter to Eastern District of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Trail By Magistrate Judge form, #2 Consent Brochure) (kdb) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #5 MOTION to to transfer venue. Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana, New Albany Division. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/8/2019.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by American Commercial Barge Line LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/2/2019. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge Division. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Division 3 Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jeremy Joost re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5)(Taylor, Ian) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/20/2019.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. **Document contains incorrect name of Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren A. Guichard added to party American Commercial Barge Line LLC(pty:dft).(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED SEAMAN COMPLAINT against American Commercial Barge Line LLC filed by Jeremy Joost.(Aamodt, Jodi) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT against American Commercial Barge Line LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7413379) filed by Jeremy Joost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Jodi Jacobs Aamodt added to party Jeremy Joost(pty:pla).(Aamodt, Jodi) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.