This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:43:55 (UTC).

Jones v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00838

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Ann Jones

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan G Garrett

Attorney at Bryan Garrett PLLC

119 N Robinson, Suite 650

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W Brewer

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Jeffrey D Scott

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Debra Ann Jones. (Garrett, Bryan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan G Garrett on behalf of Debra Ann Jones (Garrett, Bryan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#7

(#7) OCTOBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 9/29/2020. (ks) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Answer to Plaintiff's Petition

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Petition

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2022 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit 5- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Debra Ann Jones. (Garrett, Bryan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan G Garrett on behalf of Debra Ann Jones (Garrett, Bryan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OCTOBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 9/29/2020. (ks) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3238026. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2022 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit 5- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less