This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2019 at 07:02:10 (UTC).

JONES v. VON MAUR, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2019 JONES filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against VON MAUR, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04360

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NADEZHDA JONES

Defendant

VON MAUR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay Meisenhelder

Attorney at JAY MEISENHELDER EMPLOYMENT & CIVIL RIGHTS LEGAL SERVICES PC

650 North Girls School Road, Suite D40

Indianapolis, IN 46214

Defendant Attorneys

Celia Pauli

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Candace A. Bankovich

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VON MAUR, INC.. (Bankovich, Candace) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by VON MAUR, INC..(Bankovich, Candace) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Candace A. Bankovich on behalf of Defendant VON MAUR, INC.. (Bankovich, Candace) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Celia Pauli on behalf of Defendant VON MAUR, INC.. (Pauli, Celia) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jay Meisenhelder hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04360-TWP-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#6

(#5) ***PLEASE DISREGARD, REFER TO #6 *** ORDER - REASSIGNING CASE - In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/28/2019. Modified on 10/28/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#5

(#5) ***PLEASE DISREGARD, REFER TO #6 *** ORDER - REASSIGNING CASE - In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/28/2019. Modified on 10/28/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to VON MAUR, INC. (REO) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Meisenhelder on behalf of Plaintiff NADEZHDA "NADIA&quo JONES. (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 10/26/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against NADEZHDA "NADIA&quo JONES, filed by NADEZHDA "NADIA&quo JONES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5695665) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 10/26/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VON MAUR, INC.. (Bankovich, Candace) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by VON MAUR, INC..(Bankovich, Candace) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Candace A. Bankovich on behalf of Defendant VON MAUR, INC.. (Bankovich, Candace) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Celia Pauli on behalf of Defendant VON MAUR, INC.. (Pauli, Celia) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jay Meisenhelder hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04360-TWP-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Clerk is directed to reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Magistrate Judge Timothy A. Baker. In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/28/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***PLEASE DISREGARD, REFER TO #6 *** ORDER - REASSIGNING CASE - In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/28/2019. Modified on 10/28/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to VON MAUR, INC. (REO) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Meisenhelder on behalf of Plaintiff NADEZHDA "NADIA&quo JONES. (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 10/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against NADEZHDA "NADIA&quo JONES, filed by NADEZHDA "NADIA&quo JONES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5695665) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 10/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Von Maur, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Candace A. Bankovich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Celia Pauli