This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:36:49 (UTC).

Jones v. US Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Jones against US Foods, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03389

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda C. Jones

Defendant

US Foods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Bailey Smith

Attorney at Smith Law Office

802 Coleman Boulevard, Suite 209

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Andrew Thomas Smith

Attorney at Work Law Group

4 Carriage Lane, Suite 403

Charleston, SC 29407

Defendant Attorney

Adam Noah Yount

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd (Chas)

134 Meeting Street, Third Floor

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/17/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/17/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/17/2020, Discovery due by 10/15/2020, Motion in Limine due by 1/29/2021, Motions due by 10/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/15/2021, Mediation Due by 11/30/2020. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after February 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 1/30/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#14

(#14) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Linda C. Jones.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by US Foods, Inc..(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Linda C. Jones.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/7/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/16/2020, Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 6/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/19/2020, Mediation Due by 8/31/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than September 28, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/18/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

7 #4

Exhibit C - proposed order

7 #3

Exhibit B - Court Admissions

7 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Affidavit In Support of motion

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharilee K. Smentek ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8822728) by US Foods, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of motion, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Court Admissions, #4 Exhibit C - proposed order)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

6 #4

Exhibit C - proposed order

6 #3

Exhibit B - Court admissions

6 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Affidavit In Support of PHV Motion

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle A. Petersen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8822704) by US Foods, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Court admissions, #4 Exhibit C - proposed order)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by US Foods, Inc..(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Linda C. Jones.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by US Foods, Inc..(dsto, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/17/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/17/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/17/2020, Discovery due by 10/15/2020, Motion in Limine due by 1/29/2021, Motions due by 10/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/15/2021, Mediation Due by 11/30/2020. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after February 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 1/30/2020. (prou, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Linda C. Jones.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by US Foods, Inc..(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Linda C. Jones.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/23/2019.(dsto, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/7/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/16/2020, Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 6/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/19/2020, Mediation Due by 8/31/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than September 28, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/18/2019. (dsto, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharilee K. Smentek ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8822728) by US Foods, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of motion, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Court Admissions, #4 Exhibit C - proposed order)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle A. Petersen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8822704) by US Foods, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Court admissions, #4 Exhibit C - proposed order)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by US Foods, Inc..(Yount, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Linda C. Jones.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by US Foods, Inc..(dsto, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-32-4429. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8808246), filed by US Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C -Summons)(dsto, ). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.