This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:21:46 (UTC).

Jones v. Uber Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and Michael J. Hluchaniuk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13391

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones

Defendant

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren Mary Sitto

Attorney at Dailey Law Firm, PC

36700 Woodward Avenue, Suite 107

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Defendant Attorneys

William S. Cook

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

17197 N. Laurel Park Drive, Suite 201

Livonia, MI 48152

John Charles Stiglich, II

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

201, 17197 North Laurel Park Drive

Livonia, MI 48152

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Uber Technologies, Inc.*. Reason: *Answer filed on 1/7/2020* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Stiglich, John) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Uber Technologies, Inc. by Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones. (Sitto, Lauren) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Stiglich, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William S. Cook appearing on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Cook, William) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Charles Stiglich, II appearing on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Stiglich, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones (Sitto, Lauren) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Uber Technologies, Inc.* (LGra) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7490708 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: San Francisco. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 19-000062-NF, Judge Martha M. Snow] (Sitto, Lauren) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Uber Technologies, Inc.*. Reason: *Answer filed on 1/7/2020* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Stiglich, John) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Uber Technologies, Inc. by Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones. (Sitto, Lauren) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Stiglich, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William S. Cook appearing on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Cook, William) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Charles Stiglich, II appearing on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Stiglich, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones (Sitto, Lauren) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Uber Technologies, Inc.* (LGra) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jay Juan-Jarmaine Jones against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7490708 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: San Francisco. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 19-000062-NF, Judge Martha M. Snow] (Sitto, Lauren) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less