This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:03:31 (UTC).

Jones v. Trusted Media Brands, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Trusted Media Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Kuntz, II and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06783

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kahlimah Jones

Defendants

Trusted Media Brands, Inc.

RDA Enthusiast Brands, LLC doing business as Tasteofhome.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan Shaked

Attorney at Shaked Law Group, P.C.

14 Harwood Court, Suite 415

Scarsdale, NY 10583

Defendant Attorney

John Michael Magliery

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons against Trusted Media Brands, Inc.

1 #3

Proposed Summons against RDA Enthusiast Brands, LLC

#2

2 #1

RDA summons

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The Motion to Stay #6 is denied. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by 3/02/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/31/2020. (Guo, Alicia) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter MOTION to Stay proceedings and for the Court to cancel all dates sine die (Jointly Submitted), by Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. (Magliery, John) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 is granted. Defendant Trusted Media Brands, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/31/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/20/2019. (Guo, Alicia) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until and including January 31, 2020 - Plaintiff consented to this request, by Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. (Magliery, John) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to RDA Enthusiast Brands, LLC, Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 RDA summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against RDA Enthusiast Brands, LLC, Trusted Media Brands, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12119533 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Kahlimah Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons against Trusted Media Brands, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons against RDA Enthusiast Brands, LLC) (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trusted Media Brands Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan Shaked