This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:31:37 (UTC).

JONES v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 JONES filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-20123

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUAWEE JONES

Bradford, PA 16701

Respondent

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

JONATHAN MICHAEL PECK

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Addendum to Motion

#2

(#2) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN GAY terminated. Attorney JONATHAN MICHAEL PECK for THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (PECK, JONATHAN) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 2:16-cr-00181-MCA-1, filed by QUAWEE JONES. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to Motion, #2 Envelope)(ams, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #1 . Mail sent to Quawee Jones (sm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #1 . Mail sent to Quawee Jones (sm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN GAY terminated. Attorney JONATHAN MICHAEL PECK for THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (PECK, JONATHAN) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 2:16-cr-00181-MCA-1, filed by QUAWEE JONES. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to Motion, #2 Envelope)(ams, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.