Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2020 at 12:11:02 (UTC).

JONES v. THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 JONES filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT JONES

Defendant

THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN K. KOONTZ

Attorney at DAGGETT SHULER KOONTZ NAUMAN & BELL, PLLC

2140 Country Club Rd.

Winston-Salem, NC 27104

Defendant Attorney

HANNAH S. SYMONDS

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.

8529 Six Forks Road, Forum Iv, Suite 600

Raleigh, NC 27615

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/27/2020; that Consented to Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #8 ] to file an answer or responsive pleading, up to and including, August 18, 2020 is GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including, August 18, 2020 to file an answer or responsive pleading to the Complaint. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SYMONDS, HANNAH) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SYMONDS, HANNAH) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HANNAH S. SYMONDS on behalf of Defendant THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (SYMONDS, HANNAH) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (KOONTZ, JOHN) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2818895), filed by ROBERT JONES. (KOONTZ, JOHN) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/27/2020; that Consented to Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #8 ] to file an answer or responsive pleading, up to and including, August 18, 2020 is GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including, August 18, 2020 to file an answer or responsive pleading to the Complaint. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SYMONDS, HANNAH) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 7/28/2020. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on July 2, 2020 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SYMONDS, HANNAH) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HANNAH S. SYMONDS on behalf of Defendant THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (SYMONDS, HANNAH) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (KOONTZ, JOHN) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2818895), filed by ROBERT JONES. (KOONTZ, JOHN) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant